Joarder, Mohammad Zahid Hossain (CPSO#: 89552)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dhaka, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014