Jocelyn, Leslie Janet (CPSO#: 57891)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions:  Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Email: to debbie@emergingminds.ca Tel: (613) 728-3808
Date Received: 30 Apr 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013