Jodrey, James Franklin (CPSO#: 22479)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Sep 1991

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Oct 1990
Summary:

In October 1990, Dr. Jodrey pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 
448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.    The Discipline Committee 
accepted this plea, and found Dr. Jodrey guilty of professional misconduct.    Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
Jodrey's licence to practice medicine be suspended for a minimum of three months, and until the following conditions were 
met: 
 
   1. that Dr. Jodrey was to consult with the Director of the Educational Department of the College of Physicians and 
      Surgeons of Ontario regarding the appropriate assessment of his knowledge, skill and judgment in respect of the 
      practice of medicine; 
 
   2. that as part of this assessment, Dr. Jodrey was to be referred by the Director of the Educational Department of the 
      College to the McMaster Physician Review Program; 
 
   3. that Dr. Jodrey was to consent to the release by the College to the McMaster Physician Review Program of any 
      information considered appropriate by the Director of Education of the College prior to the assessment taking place; 
 
   4. that Dr. Jodrey was to attend the McMaster Physician Review Program and was to cooperate in every respect with the 
      assessment provided by the Program; 
 
   5. that Dr. Jodrey was to consent to the release by the McMaster Physician Review Program to the College of Physicians 
      and Surgeons of Ontario of any information with respect to the assessment and the result of the assessment as might 
      be considered necessary by the Director of the Educational Department of the College; 
 
   6. that Dr. Jodrey was to complete any period of supervision and any program of upgrading which might be 
      recommended by the Physician Review Program successfully and to the satisfaction of the Registrar, was to submit to 
      such further reassessment or reassessments as might from time to time be recommended by the Physician Review 
      Program, and was to complete any training, upgrading or period of supervision recommended by the Physician 
      Review Program from time to time on the occasion of any reassessment or reassessments which might be 
      recommended; 
 
   7. that Dr. Jodrey was to pay to the College the cost of his assessment at the McMaster Physician Review Program 
      forthwith after being invoiced at an amount determined by the Registrar of the College, not to exceed $8000.00; and  
 
   8. that the Registrar would determine when the terms and conditions had been satisfied, thereby ending the suspension 
      of Dr. Jodrey's licence. 

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 09 Oct 1990