Joffe, Jacobo (CPSO#: 53039)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 11 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Dec 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2007
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2008

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Dec 2008
Summary:

 On December 11, 2008, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Joffe committed acts of professional 
 misconduct in that he sexually abused patients under clause 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professional 
 Procedural Code (the (Code() and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that having regard to all of the circumstances, would be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed 
 that:

1.	The Registrar revoke Dr. Joffe(s certificate of registration effective 
 immediately.
2.	Dr. Joffe appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3.	Dr. Joffe reimburse the 
 College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the 
 Code, by posting an irrovocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, by 
 January 30, 2009, in the amount of $40,000.
4.	Dr. Joffe pay costs to the College in the amount of 
 $3,650 by January 30, 2009.
5.	The results of this proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 11, 2008