Johal, Herman Singh (CPSO#: 107293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orthopaedic Trauma Service
Hamilton General Hospital
Floor 5N, Room 532
237 Barton St. E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44721
Fax: 905 575 1426
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Johal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Johal ( CPSO# 107293)

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Floor 5N, Room 527
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Centre for Evidence Based Orthopaedics
110 - 293 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 8E7
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5330

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERMAN SINGH JOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015