Johal, Sukhvinder Singh (CPSO#: 104488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Hospitalist medicine
200 terrace Rd
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5544
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1332 Khalsa Dr. Suite 1
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5S 0A2
Canada
Phone: (905) 696-7070
Fax: (905) 696-7090
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sukhvinder S. Johal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Johal ( CPSO# 104488)

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Hospitalist Medicine
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUKHVINDER SINGH JOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016