Johar, Karanpal (CPSO#: 98771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Western Australia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 190
2525 Old Bronte Rd.
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (289)837-0222
Fax: (289)837-1222
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7700 Hurontario St
Unit 310A
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Canada
Phone: 6474788105
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karanpal Johar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Johar ( CPSO# 98771 )

Business Address:
310A - 7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone Number: (647) 478-8105

Business Address:
Suite 190
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (289) 837-0222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARANPAL JOHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2014