John, Susan (CPSO#: 108909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 26 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: 6137378899 Ext. 73249
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN JOHN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JOHN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. JOHN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JOHN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. JOHN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JOHN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JOHN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Aug 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018