John, Verghese (CPSO#: 77386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:Ranchi University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Mental Healh Association
Suite 500
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone: (416) 789-7957 Ext. 3215
Fax: (416) 289-6843
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Verghese John Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. John ( CPSO# 77386 )

Business Address:
Suite 500
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 289-6285

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERGHESE JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Feb 2002 to 31 May 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2002