John, Verity Jayne (CPSO#: 77550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
89 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-0001
Fax: (905) 848-6360
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

c/o Stroke Prevention clinic
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B2V2
Canada
Phone: 9058487379
Fax: 9058487669
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Verity J. John Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. John ( CPSO# 77550 )

Business Address:
Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-0001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 31 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERITY JAYNE JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008