Johns, Christine Ruth (CPSO#: 53001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Johns ( CPSO# 53001 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4773

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE RUTH JOHNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1986