Johns, David George (CPSO#: 60662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Dundas Street
Dundas ON  L9H 1A1
Phone: (905) 628-6151
Fax: (905) 628-1609
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David G. Johns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Johns ( CPSO# 60662 )

Business Address:
33 Dundas Street
Dundas ON  L9H 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 628-6151

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GEORGE JOHNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990