Johns, Peter Douglas (CPSO#: 53904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79002
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P.D. Johns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Johns ( CPSO# 54262 )
Dr. P. Johns ( CPSO# 53904 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Emergency Department
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER DOUGLAS JOHNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1985