Johns, Robert William Geoffrey (CPSO#: 50853)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2011