Johnsen, Jon Henry (CPSO#: 71296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1212
Fax: (807) 623-2316
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J & B Johnsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Johnsen ( CPSO# 71297 )
Dr. J. Johnsen ( CPSO# 71296 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JON HENRY JOHNSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1999