Johnson, Andrew Norman (CPSO#: 64107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Phone: (905) 454-2080
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW NORMAN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992