Johnson, Charles Neil (CPSO#: 33011)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: AMJ Campbell Van Lines 1234 Gardiners Road Kingston ON K7P 2T5
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 04 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016