Johnson, Christopher Benjamin (CPSO#: 72479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medicine
Division of Cardiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8582
Fax: (613) 737-8918
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Merivale Medical Imaging
1370 Clyde Ave
Ottawa ON  K2G3H8
Canada
Phone: 613-727-1072
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Merivale Cardiovascular Diagnostics
1370 Clyde Ave
Ottawa ON  K2G3H8
Canada
Phone: 613-722-8086
Fax: 613-761-1944
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chris Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Johnson ( CPSO# 72479 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Medicine
Division of Cardiology
501 Smyth Road CCW 1678
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8582

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4708

Business Address:
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (316) 722-8086

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER BENJAMIN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2003