Johnson, David Alexander (CPSO#: 26980)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1997