Johnson, Donald Hugh (CPSO#: 20798)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sports Medicine Clinic Carleton University 1125 Colonel By Drive Ottawa, ON K1S 5B6
Date Received: 13 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014