Johnson, Frank Gordon (CPSO#: 15834)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 28 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Mar 1980
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 28 Jul 1993

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Jul 1993
Summary:

 In July 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Johnson guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  The Committee further found Dr. Johnson incompetent, as defined in s. 
 60(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional 
 care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the 
 patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice.  
 Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Johnson(s licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 27 Jul 1993