Johnson, Garth Edward (CPSO#: 63183)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Garth Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 12 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: 4014 Shirley Avenue, Gloucester, ON K1V 1H3
Date Received: 05 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015