Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Johnson, Gary Gale (CPSO#: 21510)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 28 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GG Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 7 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2011