Johnson, Gordon James (CPSO#: 22067)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003