Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Johnson, Jennifer Karlin (CPSO#: 68706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Apr 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayside Medical Clinic
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B9
Phone: (705) 549-5635
Fax: (705) 549-0029
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johnson Bayfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Johnson ( CPSO# 68706 )
Dr. D. Bayfield ( CPSO# 68692 )

Business Address:
3 - 349 King Street
Midland ON  L4R 3M7
Phone Number: (705) 526-4641

Business Address:
Huronia District Hospital
Emergency Department
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
PO Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
Bayside Medical Clinic
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetang ON  L9M 1B9
Phone Number: (705) 549-3939

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER KARLIN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1995