Johnson, Jo-Ann Margret (CPSO#: 54503)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 2005