Johnson, John Francis (CPSO#: 69965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-663-3319
Fax: (519) 663-3449
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John F. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Johnson ( CPSO# 69965 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN FRANCIS JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2001