Johnson, John Kenneth (CPSO#: 24945)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012