Johnson, Nicole Anne-Marie (CPSO#: 72269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alberta Children's Hospital
Section of Rheumatology
Department of Pediatrics
2888 Shaganappi Trail North West
Calgary AB  T3B 6A8
Phone: (403) 955-7771
Fax: (403) 955-2215

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE ANNE-MARIE JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2002