Johnson, Pamela Joy (CPSO#: 60658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone: (807) 624-3400 Ext. 3506
Fax: (807) 624-3525
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA JOY JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991