Johnson, Patricia Louise (CPSO#: 63310)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Apr 1997
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 1999