Johnson, Philip Quentin (CPSO#: 60376)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of North Dakota, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1990 to 31 Jul 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1991