Johnson, Ross William (CPSO#: 61915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
99 Shuniah Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 2Z2
Phone: (807) 346-9400
Fax: (807) 346-9123
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.W. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 17 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSS WILLIAM JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1990
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2001
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 10 Aug 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2006