Johnson, Sandra Marie (CPSO#: 79811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Barrie Community Health Centre
490 Huronia Road, Barrie, ON
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 734-9690
Fax: (705) 734-0239
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 Lakeside Terrace Suite 201
Barrie, ON
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Canada
Phone: 18882827763
Fax: 844 320-9652
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA MARIE JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006