Johnson, Steven Douglas William Lloyd (CPSO#: 81637)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jul 2004 to 11 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Aug 2014 to 19 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2014