Johnson, Thomas Arthur (CPSO#: 42997)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2001