Johnson, William Harold (CPSO#: 15569)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 May 2007