Johnston, Alfred Arthur (CPSO#: 13450)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1997