Johnston, Brenda Anne (CPSO#: 57375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2333 Dundas Street West
Suite 305
Toronto ON  M6R 3A6
Phone: 647-428-6700
Fax: (647) 428-0700
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA ANNE JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988