Johnston, Donna Lynn (CPSO#: 68865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Hematology/Oncology
Children's Hosp of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2210
Fax: (613) 738-4828
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donna Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Johnston ( CPSO# 68865 )

Business Address:
Department of Hematology/Oncology
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA LYNN JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2001