Johnston, Harold Alan (CPSO#: 33158)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2013