Johnston, Ian Geoffrey (CPSO#: 66754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202 King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1E5
Phone: (519) 358-1880
Fax: (519) 358-1586
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Johnston ( CPSO# 66754 )

Business Address:
100 - 202 King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 358-1880

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6401

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Business Address:
2 - 785 Tecumseh Road
Chatham ON  N8A 4K9
Phone Number: (519) 397-5455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN GEOFFREY JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1997