Johnston, Mary Elizabeth (CPSO#: 60748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5645 Ext. 2400
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990