Johnston, Paul Herbert (CPSO#: 82612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 13
391 Empire Avenue
St John's NL  A1E 1W6
Phone: (709) 754-2050

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL HERBERT JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2013