Johnston, William Hunter (CPSO#: 31615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
55 Civic Road
Scarborough ON  M1L 2K9
Phone: 416 750 3513 Ext. 217
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Johnston ( CPSO# 31615 )

Business Address:
55 Civic Road
Scarborough ON  M1L 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 750-3513

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM HUNTER JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980