Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Johnstone, David William (CPSO#: 66437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huntsville Professional Building
204 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-1268
Fax: (705) 789-9698
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Johnstone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Johnstone ( CPSO# 66437 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-1268

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM JOHNSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997