Joiner, Ross Evan (CPSO#: 69127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2016


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Surrey Memorial Hospital
13750 96 Avenue
Surrey BC  V3V 1Z2
Phone: (604) 581-2211

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia


Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ROSS EVAN JOINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOINER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016