Jokhio, Raza Mustafa (CPSO#: 75833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:University of Sind, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dynamic Medical Centre
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 Holly Street
Suite 3
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: 416 486 8088
Fax: 416 486 7888
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

10 Cottrelle Blvd,
Unit 207
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Canada
Phone: (647) 970-9522
Fax: (905) 567-7579
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jokhio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jokhio ( CPSO# 75833 )

Business Address:
Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 24 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAZA MUSTAFA JOKHIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOKHIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2003