Jolicoeur, Emilie (CPSO#: 74876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Jolicoeur, Emilie Marie Noelle (used until: 24 Oct 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 744-7000
Fax: (613) 744-8048
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emilie Jolicoeur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jolicoeur ( CPSO# 74876 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 744-7000

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILIE JOLICOEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOLICOEUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004