Jolin, Isabelle-Sophie Pierrette (CPSO#: 72063)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinique Medicale de Touraine
Unit 2B
520 Boulevard de L'Hopital
Gatineau QC  J8V 2P5
Phone: (819) 568-0212
Fax: 819-568-6310
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinique des Femmes de L'Outaouais
228 boulevard Saint-Joseph
Unit 201
Gatineau QC  J8Y 3X4
Canada
Phone: 819-778-2055
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018